There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Honoring the life and achievements of Dr. Norman E. Borlaug for his many contributions to alleviating world hunger.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/30/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10101-10102)
09/14/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
09/30/2009-1:34pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2009-1:34pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10101-10102)
09/30/2009-1:12pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 739.
09/30/2009-1:12pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10101-10105)
09/30/2009-1:12pmMr. Berman moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
09/14/2009Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
09/14/2009Introduced in House

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 09/14/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 09/14/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/17/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/17/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/17/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/17/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/21/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/21/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/21/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/21/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/21/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/22/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/22/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/29/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/29/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/30/2009

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs09/14/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.739. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/30/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Honors the life and achievements of Dr. Norman E. Borlaug for his many contributions to alleviating world hunger.