Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 09/14/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/17/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/17/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/17/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/21/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/23/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/24/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/24/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/01/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/07/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/20/2009