There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Congratulating the United States Military Academy at West Point on being named by Forbes magazine as America's Best College for 2009.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/03/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 0 (Roll no. 79).(text: CR 3/2/2010 H987)
09/15/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
03/03/2010-2:24pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/03/2010-2:24pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 0 (Roll no. 79). (text: CR 3/2/2010 H987)
03/03/2010-2:16pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1046)
03/02/2010-3:16pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/02/2010-2:57pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 747.
03/02/2010-2:57pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H987-989)
03/02/2010-2:57pmMr. Marshall moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
10/28/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
09/15/2009Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
09/15/2009Introduced in House

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/24/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/24/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/24/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/24/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/24/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/01/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 10/01/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/08/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/14/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/14/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/14/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/14/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/14/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/21/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/21/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/21/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/23/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/28/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/21/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/02/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services09/15/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel10/28/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.747. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/03/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Congratulates the United States Military Academy on being named by Forbes magazine as America's Best College for 2009.

Supports the Academy's mission "to educate, train, and inspire the Corps of Cadets so that each graduate is a commissioned leader of character committed to the values of Duty, Honor, Country and prepared for a career of professional excellence and service to the nation as an officer in the U.S. Army."