Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/24/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/24/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/24/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/24/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/24/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/01/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 10/01/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/08/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/14/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/14/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/14/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/14/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/14/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/21/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/21/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/21/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/23/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/28/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/21/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/02/2010