Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 09/17/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 09/17/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/23/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/25/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/29/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/29/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/29/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/30/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/04/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/14/2009