Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/17/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 09/17/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/22/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/30/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/15/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/15/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/20/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/23/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/29/2009