Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/22/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 01/22/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 01/22/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 01/22/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 01/22/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/22/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/22/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/27/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/27/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/27/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/27/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/27/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 01/27/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/27/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 01/27/2009
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 01/27/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/27/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/27/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/27/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/27/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/27/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/27/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/27/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/27/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/27/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 01/27/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 01/27/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/27/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/27/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 01/27/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 01/27/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/27/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 01/27/2009
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/28/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/28/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 01/28/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 02/11/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/11/2009