Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/22/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/22/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/22/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/22/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/22/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/22/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/22/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/22/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/22/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/22/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/23/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/01/2009