Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 11/03/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/19/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/19/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/21/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/21/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/21/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/21/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/21/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/13/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/13/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/13/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/16/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/29/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/30/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/30/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/21/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 12/21/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/21/2010