Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/23/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/07/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/20/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/26/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/15/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/22/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/17/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/17/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/27/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/27/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/20/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/14/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/22/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/15/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/15/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/15/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/15/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/15/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/29/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/29/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/29/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/02/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/15/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/15/2010