Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 09/24/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/24/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 09/24/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/25/2010