There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

Recognizing the importance of youth runaway prevention and at-risk youth programs.

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing and supporting the goals and ideals of National Runaway Prevention Month.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/14/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 341 - 0 (Roll no. 969).(text: CR H14839)
09/25/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
12/14/2009-6:58pmThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
12/14/2009-6:58pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/14/2009-6:58pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 341 - 0 (Roll no. 969). (text: CR H14839)
12/14/2009-6:31pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H14843-14844)
12/14/2009-5:01pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/14/2009-4:53pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 779.
12/14/2009-4:53pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H14839-14840)
12/14/2009-4:53pmMr. Lynch moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
12/10/2009Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
12/10/2009Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/25/2009Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
09/25/2009Introduced in House

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/25/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/25/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/25/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/25/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/19/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/19/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/19/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/19/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/19/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/19/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 11/19/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/19/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 11/19/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/19/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/19/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/19/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/02/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/02/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/03/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/03/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 12/03/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/03/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 12/03/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/03/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/03/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 12/03/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/03/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/03/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/03/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/03/2009

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform09/25/2009 Referred to
12/10/2009 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.779. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/14/2009)

Recognizes the importance of youth runaway prevention and urges support for greater public awareness efforts and effective runaway youth prevention programs.