There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the celebration of Filipino American History Month in October.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/02/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H12172)
09/25/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
11/02/2009-4:35pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/02/2009-4:35pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H12172)
11/02/2009-4:22pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 780.
11/02/2009-4:22pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H12172-12174)
11/02/2009-4:22pmMr. Lynch moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
10/29/2009Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
10/29/2009Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/25/2009Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
09/25/2009Introduced in House

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/06/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/06/2009
Del. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/06/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/06/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/06/2009
Del. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/06/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/06/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/06/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/06/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/07/2009
Del. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/07/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/15/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/15/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/20/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/20/2009
Del. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/20/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/23/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/23/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/23/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/23/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 10/23/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/23/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/23/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/23/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 10/23/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/23/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/23/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/23/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/23/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 10/23/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/27/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/27/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/29/2009

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform09/25/2009 Referred to
10/29/2009 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.780. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/02/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Recognizes the celebration of Filipino American History Month as a study of the advancement of Filipino Americans and as a time to renew efforts toward the examination of history and culture in order to provide an opportunity for all people in the United States to learn more about Filipino Americans and their historic contributions to the Nation.