Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/06/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/06/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/06/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/06/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/06/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/06/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/06/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/07/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/15/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/15/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/20/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/20/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/23/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/23/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/23/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/23/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 10/23/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/23/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/23/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/23/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 10/23/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/23/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/23/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/23/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/23/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 10/23/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/27/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/27/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/29/2009