Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 09/29/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/01/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 10/01/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/01/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/06/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/07/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/07/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/08/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/08/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/08/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/08/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/08/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/08/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/08/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/13/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/13/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/13/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/13/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/13/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/14/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 10/15/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/15/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/15/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/20/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/20/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/26/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/26/2009