Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 09/30/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 09/30/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 10/06/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/06/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 10/07/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/07/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 10/07/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/07/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 10/07/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/07/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/07/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/07/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/07/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/08/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/08/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/08/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/08/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/08/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/08/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/13/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/13/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 10/13/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/13/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/13/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/13/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/13/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/15/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/15/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/15/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/15/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/15/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/15/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/15/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 10/15/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/15/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/15/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/15/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/20/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/20/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/22/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/23/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/26/2009