Text: H.Res.794 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/01/2009)


111th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. RES. 794


Calling for a runoff election in Afghanistan between the two top finishers.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

October 1, 2009

Mr. Rohrabacher (for himself, Mr. Delahunt, and Mr. Burton of Indiana) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs


RESOLUTION

Calling for a runoff election in Afghanistan between the two top finishers.

    Whereas nearly one in four votes in last month’s Afghan presidential elections were cast at polling stations now subject to a recount and audit for possible fraud;

    Whereas approximately one-third of Mr. Karzai’s 3,100,000 votes were cast at polling stations that face a recount and audit of ballot boxes;

    Whereas based on the criteria set by the Electoral Complaints Commission (ECC), a United Nations backed Afghan and international panel that is the ultimate arbiter of the election, almost 3,000 of the 23,000 polling stations would be subject to the fraud review;

    Whereas those polling stations account for a large proportion of ballots, some 1,350,000 of 5,660,000 total votes;

    Whereas the ECC said that it had found “clear and convincing evidence of fraud in a number of polling stations” in the southern and eastern provinces;

    Whereas the analysis also shows that slightly more than a quarter million of Mr. Karzai’s votes came from polling stations where he received exactly 600 ballots and no other candidate received a single vote;

    Whereas, on September 10, 2009, the ECC ordered the invalidation of certain ballots from 51 polling stations in Kandahar province and from 27 polling stations in Ghazni province, and ordered the International Election Commission (IEC) to invalidate results from 5 polling stations in Paktika province;

    Whereas between the election on August 20, 2009, and September 8, 2009, the ECC has received a total of 2,842 election complaints; and

    Whereas Grant Kippen, a Canadian and the chairman of the ECC, said the irregularities found include ballots not being folded, meaning they would not fit in a ballot box slot, identically marked ballots, and overly large counts at polling stations: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the House of Representatives calls for a runoff election between the two top finishers.