There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Conveying the best wishes of the House of Representatives to those celebrating Diwali.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/06/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
10/29/2009Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
10/29/2009Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/06/2009Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
10/06/2009Introduced in House

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/08/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/08/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/14/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/14/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/14/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/14/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/14/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/14/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/15/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 10/15/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/23/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/23/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/23/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/23/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/23/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/23/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 10/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/23/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/23/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/23/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/23/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/28/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/28/2009

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform10/06/2009 Referred to
10/29/2009 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.Res.798.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.798. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/06/2009)

Recognizes the historical and religious significance of Diwali.

Celebrates the rich cultural and religious diversity of the people of the United States and the freedom of religion guaranteed to all Americans.

Conveys best wishes to its fellow Americans and to people around the world celebrating Diwali.