Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/08/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/08/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/14/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/14/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/14/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/14/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/14/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/14/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/15/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 10/15/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/23/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/23/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/23/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/23/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/23/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/23/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 10/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/23/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/23/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/23/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/23/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/28/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/28/2009