Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 10/06/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/07/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/07/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/07/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 10/07/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/07/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/08/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/08/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/08/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/08/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 10/08/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/08/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/08/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/08/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/08/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/08/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/08/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/08/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/13/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/13/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/13/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/13/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/13/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/14/2009