Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 11/03/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 11/16/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/16/2010