There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

Recognizing the significant contributions of the Military Working Dog Program to the United States Armed Forces.

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the significant contributions of the Military Working Dog (MWD) Program to the United States Armed Forces.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/02/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H991)
10/07/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
03/02/2010-3:42pmThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
03/02/2010-3:42pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/02/2010-3:42pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H991)
03/02/2010-3:27pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 812.
03/02/2010-3:27pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H991-993)
03/02/2010-3:27pmMr. Marshall moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
10/28/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
10/07/2009Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
10/07/2009Introduced in House

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 10/07/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/26/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/26/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/17/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/18/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/02/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/02/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/02/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/02/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/02/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/02/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/02/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/02/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 12/02/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/02/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/02/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/02/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/03/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/03/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/03/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/03/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/09/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/15/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/02/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services10/07/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel10/28/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.812.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.812. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/02/2010)

Recognizes the significant contributions of the Military Working Dog (MWD) Program to the U.S. Armed Forces.

Honors active and retired MWDs for their loyal service and dedication to protecting the men and women of the Armed Forces.

Supports the adoption and care of these quality animals after such service.