Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 10/07/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/26/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/26/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/17/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/18/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/02/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/02/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/02/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/02/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/02/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/02/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/02/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/02/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 12/02/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/02/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/02/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/02/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/03/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/03/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/03/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/03/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/09/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/15/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/02/2010