Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 10/21/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/26/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 11/18/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/02/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/02/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/02/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/02/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/02/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/02/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 12/02/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/02/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/03/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 12/03/2009