Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 11/19/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/25/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/25/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/25/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/25/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/25/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 02/25/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/19/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/19/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/19/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/24/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/24/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/24/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/13/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/13/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 04/13/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/15/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/20/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/20/2010