Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/22/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 10/22/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/22/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/26/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/26/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/26/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/26/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/27/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/27/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/04/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/04/2009