Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/02/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/02/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/02/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/05/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/14/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/24/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/22/2010