Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/26/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/26/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/26/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/26/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/26/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/26/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/29/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/29/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 10/29/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/29/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/29/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/29/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/29/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/29/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 10/29/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/29/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/02/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 11/02/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/02/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/02/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/05/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/05/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/05/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 11/17/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 11/17/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 11/17/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 11/17/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/19/2009