Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 10/28/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/28/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/28/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 10/28/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/28/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/29/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/29/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/02/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/18/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/14/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/26/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/09/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/10/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/24/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/13/2010