Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 10/29/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/29/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 10/29/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 10/29/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 10/29/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 10/29/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/29/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/03/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/03/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/03/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/03/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 11/03/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/03/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/03/2009
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/03/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/03/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/03/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/03/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/03/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 11/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 11/03/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/03/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 11/03/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/03/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/03/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 11/04/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/04/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/04/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 11/05/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/05/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/05/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 11/05/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/05/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 11/06/2009