Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 11/03/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/26/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 02/26/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/26/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/26/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/26/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/26/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/26/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/26/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/26/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/26/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/26/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 02/26/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/26/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/26/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 02/26/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/04/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/10/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/11/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/14/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/26/2010