Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/28/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 01/28/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/03/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/03/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/09/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/09/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/04/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/10/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/09/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/09/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/09/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/09/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/20/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/21/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/22/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/22/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/22/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/22/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/27/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/29/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 10/29/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/29/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/29/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/02/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/02/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 11/02/2009