Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 11/16/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/17/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/17/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/17/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/17/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 11/17/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/17/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/17/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 11/17/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/17/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/17/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/17/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/17/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/17/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/17/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 11/17/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/17/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/17/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/17/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/17/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 11/19/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 12/01/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/01/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/01/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/03/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/03/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/07/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/07/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/07/2009