Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/16/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/16/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/16/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/16/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/18/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/18/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/18/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/18/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/18/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/18/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/19/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/19/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/02/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/02/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/02/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/13/2010