Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/02/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/13/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/13/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 01/13/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/19/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/19/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/19/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/19/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/19/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/21/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/21/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/21/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/21/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/21/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/21/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/21/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 01/21/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/21/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/21/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/21/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/21/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/21/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 01/21/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/21/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/27/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/27/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/27/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/22/2010