Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 11/19/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/09/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/09/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/09/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/11/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/11/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 12/11/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/16/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/16/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 02/04/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 02/04/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/03/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/03/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/21/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/21/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/04/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/21/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/21/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/21/2010