Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/19/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/19/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/19/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/19/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/19/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/19/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/19/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/19/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/19/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/19/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/01/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/01/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/02/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 12/02/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/02/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/02/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/02/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/02/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/02/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/03/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/03/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 12/03/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/03/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/03/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/03/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 12/03/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/03/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/03/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/03/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 12/03/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 12/03/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/03/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 12/03/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/03/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/03/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 12/03/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/08/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 12/08/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/08/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/08/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 12/08/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/10/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/10/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/10/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/10/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/12/2010