Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/03/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/03/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/03/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/03/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/03/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/03/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/03/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/03/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/03/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/22/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/22/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 01/22/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/02/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/02/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/12/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/01/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/28/2010