Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 12/10/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/15/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 01/19/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 01/21/2010