Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 12/03/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 12/03/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 12/09/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/09/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/09/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/09/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/11/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/16/2009