There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Amending the Rules of the House of Representatives to require a two-thirds vote on a stand-alone bill to increase the statutory limit on the public debt.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/03/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
12/03/2009Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
12/03/2009Introduced in House

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 12/03/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/07/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/07/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/11/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 12/11/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/29/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules12/03/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.949. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/03/2009)

Amends Rule XXVIII (Statutory Limit on Public Debt) of the Rules of the House of Representatives to repeal procedures for considering legislation that increases the statutory debt limit. Makes it out of order to consider such legislation if there is any other matter in it.

Prohibits legislation that increases the statutory limit on the public debt from being considered as passed or agreed to unless so determined by a vote of at least two-thirds of the Members.