Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/09/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/09/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/09/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/09/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/09/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/09/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/09/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/09/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/09/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/10/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/10/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/10/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/10/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/10/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/10/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/10/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/10/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/10/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/10/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/10/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/10/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/11/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/11/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/11/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/14/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/14/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 12/14/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 12/14/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/14/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/15/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/15/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/16/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew