Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/10/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/10/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/10/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/11/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/19/2010