Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 12/08/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/10/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/10/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/10/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/11/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/14/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/14/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/14/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/26/2010