Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/12/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 01/12/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/12/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/12/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/12/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/12/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/13/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 01/19/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 01/19/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 01/19/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/19/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/19/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/19/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/19/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/27/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/27/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/02/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/24/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/15/2010