Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/12/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/12/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/02/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/11/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/20/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/20/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/23/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/15/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/20/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/05/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/05/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/12/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/26/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/08/2010