Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/12/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/20/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/20/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/20/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/20/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/20/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/21/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/21/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/21/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/21/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/21/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/21/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 01/26/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/26/2010