Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 12/19/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 12/19/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 12/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/26/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/26/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/26/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/26/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/26/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/26/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/26/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/02/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/02/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/02/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/02/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/02/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/22/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/22/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/22/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 02/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/22/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/22/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/22/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/26/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/26/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/26/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/10/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/10/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/23/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/23/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/23/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/23/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/24/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/24/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/24/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/24/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/24/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/24/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/24/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/24/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/13/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/13/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/13/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/13/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/20/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/13/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/18/2010