Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/11/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/14/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/20/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/20/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/02/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/25/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/13/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/07/2010