Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/21/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/15/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/28/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 08/06/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/08/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/13/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/02/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/26/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/12/2010